MA H1316 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to reducing barriers to housing. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to reducing barriers to housing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-08HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2024-04-08HouseRules suspended
2024-04-08HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2024-03-14HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2024-03-04HouseNo further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-11-06JointHearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H1145 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
H2135 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Accompanied S1354
S619 (Similar To) 2024-04-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S2748

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback