MA H1316 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a board of administrations of sheriffs. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to sheriffs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-04-11 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-12-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-11-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S1343 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1316 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1316.pdf |