MA H1314 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to statewide public housing applications and the centralized waitlist system. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to CHAMP that will revert back to local residents receiving priority over applicants that have not been screened as emergency applicants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-16HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-05SenateSenate concurred
2024-03-04HouseReporting date extended to Friday April 12, 2024, pending concurrence
2024-03-04HouseNo further action take on the extension to Thursday, April 18, 2024
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Thursday April 18, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-06-05JointHearing scheduled for 06/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H1315 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 10, 2024, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback