MA H1314 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4688
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4688
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4688
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a homeless persons bill of rights. Housing.
Title
Providing a bill of rights for people experiencing homelessness
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4688 |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-17 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday March 18, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-07-08 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H113 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4162
S30 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2395
H106 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4162
H4162 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2395 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H4688 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S30 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2395
H106 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4162
H4162 (Similar To) 2019-11-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2395 (Similar To) 2020-10-29 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
H4688 (Replaced by) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1314 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1314.pdf |