MA H1293 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4941
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4941
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit access for convicted level 2 or level 3 sex offenses to certain public housing subsidized by the Commonwealth. Housing.
Title
Prohibiting level 2 and level 3 sex offenders from public housing hotels and motels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4941 |
2019-04-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2 |
2019-04-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in 437 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H3476 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S954 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H3416 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1438 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3418 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4941 (Replaced by) 2020-09-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S954 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S778 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H3416 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S1438 (Similar To) 2019-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3418 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H4941 (Replaced by) 2020-09-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1293 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1293.pdf |