MA H1283 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied S777
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-31 - Accompanied S777
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a community health center nurse practitioner residency program for the purposes of recruiting and retaining nurse practitioners at community health centers. Health Care Financing.
Title
Promoting workforce development and provider retention at community health centers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | Senate | Accompanied S777 |
2021-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S777 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1422 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3174
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1226 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
S1422 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S3174
S1186 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
S1226 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2691
S744 (Similar To) 2022-05-05 - Accompanied H1316
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1283 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1283.pdf |