MA H1281 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5340
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5340
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the group insurance commission and Medicare health benefit supplement plans. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to the Group Insurance Commission and Medicare migration
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Thomas Golden [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5340 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday March 11, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-11-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-05-24 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H2583 (Similar To) 2022-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4960
S640 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2573 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
S766 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1659 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1713 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1760 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S666 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S667 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S694 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H5340 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S794 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1174 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
H1267 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
S640 (Similar To) 2022-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2573 (Similar To) 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5206
S766 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
S1659 (Similar To) 2021-12-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1713 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S1760 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2679
S666 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S667 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S694 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H5340 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S794 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1174 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
H1267 (Similar To) 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5222
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1281 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1281.pdf |