MA H1268 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-21 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide full student representation on the University of Massachusetts Board of Trustees. Higher Education.
Title
Providing full student representation on the University of Massachusetts Board of Trustees
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H572 (Similar To) 2023-09-20 - Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 02:00 PM-08:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1268 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1268.pdf |