MA H1268 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the definition of consistent with local needs under the affordable housing law. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the definition of consistent with local needs in chapter 40b

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H1323 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2457 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H1655 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Hearing scheduled for 06/18/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H1307 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3212 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
S814 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S815 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S791 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2
S813 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1327 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S817 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S804 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1263 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1470 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S778 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 04/30/2019 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-2
H3696 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback