MA H1264 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to rental and mortgage arrearage assistance programs for certain households at risk of eviction or foreclosure. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To further provide a rental arrearage program

Sponsors

Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]
Sen. Michael Barrett [D]Rep. Natalie Blais [D]Sen. William Brownsberger [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Daniel Carey [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]
Sen. Sonia Chang-Diaz [D]Sen. Nick Collins [D]Sen. Joanne Comerford [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]
Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Sen. Anne Gobi [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Rep. Randy Hunt [R]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]
Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]
Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Rep. Christina Minicucci [D]Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]
Rep. James O'Day [D]Rep. Sarah Peake [D]Rep. Elizabeth Poirier [R]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Sen. Rebecca Rausch [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]Sen. Michael Rush [D]
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Andres Vargas [D]
Rep. David Vieira [R]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Sen. James Welch [D]Rep. Bud Williams [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2019-12-10JointHearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in A1 & A2
2019-12-10JointHearing scheduled for 01/14/2020 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

S1661 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/10/2019 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S108 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2534
H2544 (Similar To) 2020-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1942 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1648 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback