MA H1252 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to rent, landlords and security deposits. Housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to advance rent and security deposits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Housing

Same As/Similar To

H1113 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1357 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2116 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
H3401 (Similar To) 2019-07-08 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H2499 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
S1603 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback