MA H1248 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to student load debt. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study student loan debt relief programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-07-16JointHearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2478 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H2553 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H1262 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Hearing rescheduled to 12/03/2019 from 12:00 PM-01:00 PM in B-2
H2963 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Senate concurred
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1439 (Similar To) 2019-10-16 - Hearing rescheduled to 10/22/2019 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-1
H2450 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H474 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H560 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2052 (Similar To) 2019-11-21 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2428 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback