MA H1230 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Mark of Peru, a petition of Paul W. Mark and others for the adoption of resolutions by the General Court supporting efforts to ensure that students from Massachusetts have access to debt-free higher education at public colleges and universities. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolutions supporting efforts to ensure that students from Massachusetts have access to debt-free higher education at public colleges and universities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-07-16JointHearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H1827 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H476 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H477 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H510 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
H558 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Hearing rescheduled to 07/02/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-2
S238 (Similar To) 2019-09-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2348
S731 (Similar To) 2019-06-28 - Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2
S324 (Similar To) 2019-07-03 - Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 222
S762 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S261 (Similar To) 2019-05-24 - Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S1859 (Similar To) 2019-07-25 - Accompanied H525
S218 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
S759 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S760 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S761 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S2248 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2019 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H3911 (Similar To) 2019-08-26 - Hearing scheduled for 09/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
H4041 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Read third and passed to be engrossed
S2324 (Similar To) 2019-09-27 - Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2399 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - New draft substituted, see S2459
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
H4275 (Similar To) 2020-01-17 - Hearing scheduled for 01/27/2020 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback