MA H1229 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to requiring institutions of higher education to provide uniform financial aid information to accepted applicants. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring institutions of higher education to provide uniform financial aid information to accepted applicants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13SenateSenate concurred
2020-02-05HouseReporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-07-16JointHearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H1235 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
S750 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
H1247 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Senate concurred
H3655 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
H1236 (Similar To) 2019-07-16 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1
H1237 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4420

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback