MA H1226 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Moran of Lawrence, a petition of Frank A. Moran and others that MassHealth make payments for certain graduate medical education training. Health Care Financing.
Title
To promote graduate medical education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-03-28 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 3, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H2953 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H87 (Similar To) 2023-09-25 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1170 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H3624 (Similar To) 2023-11-03 - Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H87 (Similar To) 2023-09-25 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1170 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Senate concurred
H3624 (Similar To) 2023-11-03 - Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1226 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1226.pdf |