MA H1211 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5209
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide scholarships for the cost of tuition and fees for certain non-first year students at public colleges or universities. Higher Education.
Title
To establish a finish line grant program to encourage college completion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5209 |
2020-11-25 | House | House concurred |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday December 31, 2020) adopted, pending concurrence |
2020-11-19 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday November 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-18 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday April 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday March 20, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H477 (Similar To) 2020-01-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H515 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H400 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H439 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1839 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5038
S240 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S92 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S771 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1582 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S235 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4099 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2019
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5209 (Replaced by) 2020-12-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H515 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H400 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H439 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H1839 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5038
S240 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S92 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S771 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2541
S261 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
H1582 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
S235 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S328 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S559 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S2183 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4075
S2248 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S2324 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2581
S2348 (Similar To) 2019-10-03 - New draft substituted, see S2350
H4099 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 113 of the Acts of 2019
H4135 (Similar To) 2019-10-21 - Adopted, see S2365
H4137 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - Published as amended, see H4145
H4145 (Similar To) 2019-10-23 - See S2365
S2412 (Similar To) 2019-11-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 132 of the Acts of 2019
S2398 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H5209 (Replaced by) 2020-12-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1211 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1211.pdf |