MA H1209 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4418
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 104-13)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4418
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to sexual violence on higher education campuses. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to sexual violence on higher education campuses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4418 |
2019-03-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1724 (Similar To) 2020-10-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
H4418 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4418 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1209 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1209.pdf |