MA H1182 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4780
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4780
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Medicaid coverage for physical, emotional, and educational support services provided by trained professionals. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to Medicaid coverage for doula services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4780 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday May 30, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-08-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-04-01 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H1129 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1172 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1149 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1144 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S704 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S705 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1211 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4780 (Replaced by) 2020-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1172 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H1149 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1144 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
S704 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S705 (Similar To) 2019-09-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1211 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H4780 (Replaced by) 2020-06-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1182 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1182.pdf |