MA H1163 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a special commission (including members of the General Court) to study the implementation of single payer health care in the Commonwealth. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special commission to study the implementation of single payer health care in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-06-04JointHearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S1861 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
S561 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S838 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S2221 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2531
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H4020 (Similar To) 2019-08-01 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 49 of the Acts of 2019
S2309 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2321 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - House concurred
H4070 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Senate concurred
H1914 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H2060 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H190 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
S2437 (Similar To) 2020-01-29 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 15 of the Acts of 2020

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback