MA H1162 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish penalties for the filing of false reports against police officers. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing penalties for the filing of false reports against police officers
Sponsors
Rep. Bruce Ayers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-07-14 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-07-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H617 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2939 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H151 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2940 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2438 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H617 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2939 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H151 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H2940 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H2438 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1162 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1162.pdf |