MA H1145 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-31 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to healthcare coverage of applied behavioral analysis therapy for certain patients with Down Syndrome. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to applied behavioral analysis therapy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-31HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
2022-03-30HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2021-09-28JointHearing scheduled for 10/12/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S690 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 1, 2022, pending concurrence
H2409 (Similar To) 2021-05-21 - Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback