MA H1145 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the treatment of epilepsy and seizure disorders. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the treatment of epilepsy and seizure disorders

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-03-27JointHearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H730 (Similar To) 2019-07-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H222 (Similar To) 2020-02-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1743 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4536
H907 (Similar To) 2020-04-30 - Senate concurred
H1741 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
H2763 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1719 (Similar To) 2020-05-18 - Accompanied S1153
S563 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H1711 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4450
S1139 (Similar To) 2020-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2194 (Similar To) 2020-05-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4722

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback