MA H1144 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to hospital profit transparency and fairness and the establishment of a Medicaid reimbursement enhancement fund. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to hospital profit transparency and fairness

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20JointHearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

H1172 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1986 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H1150 (Similar To) 2019-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S729 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S167 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1190 (Similar To) 2019-05-20 - Hearing scheduled for 05/28/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
H1927 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback