MA H1133 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the pricing of prescription drugs. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To ensure prescription drug cost transparency and affordability

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22HouseReporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-03-27JointHearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S570 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S721 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
H898 (Similar To) 2019-09-12 - Hearing scheduled for 09/23/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H1972 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H3489 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4449
H1162 (Similar To) 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback