MA H1130 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5003
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing for discounts in motor vehicle insurance premiums for completion of a marijuana impairment education course. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to insurance discounts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5003 |
2021-08-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1068 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2665
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H179 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4547
S73 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4133 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S74 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S76 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S1349 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H5003 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1909 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied a study order, see S2743
H179 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4547
S73 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2529 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4133 (Similar To) 2022-02-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4440
S74 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S76 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2661
S1349 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H5003 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1130 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1130.pdf |