MA H1130 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4625
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to conducting a study regarding the benefits and costs of single tablet regimens or long acting alternative regimens for the treatment of HIV. Public Health.
Title
Relative to studying the benefits of single tablet regimen
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4625 |
2017-06-19 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1065 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2392 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1165 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3510 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S539 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S815 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H1353 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4625 (Replaced by) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2392 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1165 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3510 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S539 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S815 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H424 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4550
H1353 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4625 (Replaced by) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1130 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1130.pdf |