MA H1124 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4691

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4691
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to dental insurance assignment of benefits. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to dental insurance assignment of benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-30HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4691
2023-11-21JointHearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H4691 (Replaced by) 2024-05-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1110 (Similar To) 2024-05-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4691
S698 (Similar To) 2024-02-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2636

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback