MA H1123 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4975
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4975
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to contracts for pharmacy services between health insurance carriers or pharmacy benefits' managers and pharmacies or pharmacists. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to pharmaceutical gag clauses
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Hannah Kane [R] |
Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4975 |
2021-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S728 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
H4975 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4975 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1123 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1123.pdf |