MA H1116 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to municipal fines. Municipalities and Regional Government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regarding municipal fines

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-06HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-02-06HouseRules suspended
2018-02-06HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-01-31HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-09-05JointHearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government

Same As/Similar To

H400 (Similar To) 2017-09-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3896
H2546 (Similar To) 2017-10-04 - Hearing scheduled for 10/10/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H883 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H164 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H351 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
S2074 (Similar To) 2017-05-22 - Placed on file
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H2241 (Similar To) 2017-12-08 - Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
S2071 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - New draft substituted, see S2113
H1805 (Similar To) 2017-12-06 - Hearing scheduled for 12/06/17 from 1:00PM-3:00PM in A-1
H52 (Similar To) 2017-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H54 (Similar To) 2017-04-24 - Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
H24 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4350
H30 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H37 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H39 (Similar To) 2018-01-09 - Hearing scheduled for 01/16/2018 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback