MA H1101 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to insurance reimbursement of costs for medically appropriate evaluation and management services in outpatient settings, including but not limited to office and hospital-based clinics. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assuring prompt access to health care

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-22JointHearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H1084 (Similar To) 2019-10-22 - Hearing scheduled for 10/29/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
H1194 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback