MA H1099 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4976
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a matched savings account program to be administered by fiscal intermediaries. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to savings enabling prosperity
Sponsors
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. John Barrett [D] |
Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] | Rep. Natalie Higgins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-01 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4976 |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S662 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2699
S471 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5307
S102 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2657
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
S905 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3054 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H3055 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S121 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2168 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S125 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4976 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S471 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5307
S102 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2657
H3722 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 73 of the Acts of 2022
S905 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3054 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
H3055 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S121 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2168 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S1808 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S125 (Similar To) 2022-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4976 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1099 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1099.pdf |