MA H1074 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S689

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-12)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-31 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to cancer patient access to biomarker testing to provide appropriate therapy. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to cancer patient access to biomarker testing to provide appropriate therapy

Sponsors

Rep. Meghan Kilcoyne [D]Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Rep. Michael Kushmerek [D]Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D]Rep. Kelly Pease [R]Rep. Patricia Duffy [D]
Rep. Hannah Kane [R]Rep. James Arena-DeRosa [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]
Rep. Jessica Giannino [D]Sen. William Driscoll [D]Rep. Jon Santiago [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]
Sen. John Cronin [D]Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]
Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R]Sen. Walter Timilty [D]Sen. Michael Brady [D]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. Patrick Kearney [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. Michelle DuBois [D]Rep. Ted Philips [D]
Rep. Aaron Saunders [D]Rep. Rob Consalvo [D]Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]
Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]
Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Jeffrey Turco [D]Rep. Kate Donaghue [D]
Rep. Michael Soter [R]Rep. Vanna Howard [D]Rep. Sally Kerans [D]Rep. Steven Xiarhos [R]
Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. Samantha Montano [D]Rep. Fred Barrows [R]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Rep. Adrianne Ramos [D]
Rep. Shirley Arriaga [D]Rep. Rodney Elliott [D]Rep. Margaret Scarsdale [D]Rep. Bradley Jones [R]
Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Bill MacGregor [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]
Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Simon Cataldo [D]Rep. Judith Garcia [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Russell Holmes [D]Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]
Rep. Danillo Sena [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Rep. Marcus Vaughn [R]
Rep. John Moran [D]Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-12-31HouseNo further action taken
2024-06-20HouseCommittee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2024-06-20HouseAccompanied by S689
2024-05-23HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2024-03-28SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-08HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 17, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-04-28JointHearing rescheduled to 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2023-04-18JointHearing scheduled for 05/02/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A2 and virtual
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S689 (Replaces) 2024-06-20 - Accompanied H1074

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback