MA H1064 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4705
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4705
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H4705
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to modernizing private flood insurance. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to modernizing private flood insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4705 |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H931 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S557 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H935 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4705 (Replaced by) 2024-06-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S557 (Similar To) 2024-04-29 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H935 (Similar To) 2024-02-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4705 (Replaced by) 2024-06-03 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1064 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1064.pdf |