MA H1057 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate rent escrow. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to rent escrow
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Jones [R] | Rep. Nicholas Boldyga [R] | Sen. Peter Durant [R] | Rep. Fred Barrows [R] |
Rep. Susan Gifford [R] | Rep. Paul Frost [R] | Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-06-12 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-06-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H2152 (Similar To) 2024-02-15 - Accompanied S1387
H3230 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H4255 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2024 from 01:30 PM-04:30 PM in A-2
H4490 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2712 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3230 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
H4255 (Similar To) 2024-03-20 - Hearing scheduled for 03/26/2024 from 01:30 PM-04:30 PM in A-2
H4490 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
S2712 (Similar To) 2024-04-01 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1057 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1057.pdf |