MA H1054 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to payment for ambulance services provided to certain insured individuals. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to ambulance billing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01JointHearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S637 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S597 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S623 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H2245 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S613 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H1006 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S1472 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
H3746 (Similar To) 2019-05-08 - Senate concurred

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback