MA H1046 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3955
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3955
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3955
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to public higher education access and policies. Higher Education.
Title
Supporting access and excellence in public higher education
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Rep. Jennifer Benson [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] |
Rep. Timothy Madden [D] | Rep. Joseph McGonagle [D] | Rep. James Arciero [D] | Rep. Benjamin Swan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3955 |
2015-08-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/16/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H3955 (Replaced by) 2016-01-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1046 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1046.pdf |