MA H1037 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-12)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the use of certain insurance underwriting guidelines pertaining to dogs harbored upon the insured property. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning the use of certain insurance underwriting guidelines pertaining to dogs harbored upon the insured property

Sponsors

Rep. Jack Lewis [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Bruce Ayers [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]
Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]Rep. David Biele [D]Rep. Peter Capano [D]Rep. Michelle Ciccolo [D]
Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. William Crocker [R]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]
Rep. Mark Cusack [D]Sen. Julian Cyr [D]Rep. Angelo D'Emilia [R]Rep. Michael Day [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]Sen. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Mindy Domb [D]
Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]Rep. Nika Elugardo [D]Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Kimberly Ferguson [R]
Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Carole Fiola [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Sean Garballey [D]
Rep. Denise Garlick [D]Rep. Colleen Garry [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. Susan Gifford [R]
Sen. Anne Gobi [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]Rep. Tami Gouveia [D]
Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Richard Haggerty [D]Rep. James Hawkins [D]Rep. Stephan Hay [D]
Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Steven Howitt [R]Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]
Rep. Louis Kafka [D]Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. John Lawn [D]Rep. David LeBoeuf [D]
Rep. David Linsky [D]Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]
Rep. Paul Mark [D]Rep. Joseph McKenna [R]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]Sen. Mark Montigny [D]
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R]Rep. Brian Murray [D]Rep. Tram Nguyen [D]Sen. Marc Pacheco [D]
Rep. Denise Provost [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. David Robertson [D]Rep. Maria Robinson [D]
Rep. David Rogers [D]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]
Rep. Thomas Stanley [D]Sen. Bruce Tarr [R]Sen. Dean Tran [R]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]
Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D]Rep. Timothy Whelan [R]
Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H812 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2037 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
H1757 (Similar To) 2019-05-28 - Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S595 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S990 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2158 (Similar To) 2019-05-13 - Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
S1431 (Similar To) 2019-07-11 - Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2019 from 09:00 AM-11:00 AM in B-1
H3603 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H3828 (Similar To) 2019-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback