MA H1031 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4729
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to workers' compensation rates. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to fair workers' compensation rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4729 |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1573 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Accompanied S1604
S1644 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied S1503
S887 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H350 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2558
S604 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2984 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1774 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H498 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2971 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1644 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied S1503
S887 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H350 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2558
S604 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2984 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1774 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
H498 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2971 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1031 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1031.pdf |