MA H1006 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to benefits for permanent functional loss and disfigurement under the workers’ compensation law. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Providing benefits for permanent functional loss and disfigurement under the Worker's Compensation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-01-16 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2017-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/02/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
S1472 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1473 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S998 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S39 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
H3709 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3724 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4006
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1388 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2533 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
S1473 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S998 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S39 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
H3709 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3724 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4006
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1388 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2533 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
H4977 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 419 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1006 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1006.pdf |