MA H1003 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-21 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-11-21 - Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to further regulate the withdrawal of local subscribers from the Group Insurance Commission. Financial Services.
Title
Further regulating the withdrawal of local subscribers from the commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S1634 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
S1709 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
S1611 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2513 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
S2379 (Similar To) 2023-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1709 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2610
S1611 (Similar To) 2024-03-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2513 (Similar To) 2024-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4518
S2379 (Similar To) 2023-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1003 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1003.pdf |