MA H1002 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-16 - Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to auditory healthcare coverage for children. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to children's auditory health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H146 (Similar To) 2024-04-11 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
H3596 (Similar To) 2023-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2433 (Similar To) 2023-08-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2023
H3596 (Similar To) 2023-11-07 - Hearing scheduled for 11/14/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S2433 (Similar To) 2023-08-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 34 of the Acts of 2023
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1002 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1002.pdf |