LA SR82 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-06 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health to study Medicaid reimbursements for nonopioid pain treatment and opioid alternatives.
Title
Requests the Louisiana Department of Health to study Medicaid reimbursements for nonopioid pain treatment and opioid alternatives.
Sponsors
Sen. Beth Mizell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |