LA SR76 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Monday, May 10, 2021, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Title
Designates Monday, May 10, 2021, as Alzheimer's Awareness Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2021. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted. |