LA SR71 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/22/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/22/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Madison Elizabeth Smith upon her reign as Queen of the 2022 Mystick Krewe of Louisianans Washington Mardi Gras Ball.
Title
Commends Madison Elizabeth Smith upon her reign as Queen of the 2022 Mystick Krewe of Louisianans Washington Mardi Gras Ball.
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/22/2022. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |