LA SR7 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-14 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-14 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates Tuesday, June 9, 2020, as Our Lady of the Lake Children's Hospital Day at the Capitol.
Title
Designates Tuesday, June 9, 2020, as Our Lady of the Lake Children's Hospital Day at the Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2020. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted. |