LA SR7 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Read by title and adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requests the Louisiana Department of Health and the Louisiana Department of Education to coordinate an awareness effort to have children screened for scoliosis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests the Louisiana Department of Health and the Louisiana Department of Education to coordinate an awareness effort to have children screened for scoliosis.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateRead by title and adopted.
2019-04-24SenateRules suspended. Reported favorably.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback