LA SR7 | 2017 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of civil law scholar Professor A. N. Yiannopoulos.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of civil law scholar Professor A. N. Yiannopoulos.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Claitor [R] | Sen. Eddie Lambert [R] | Sen. W. Jay Luneau [D] | Sen. Daniel Martiny [R] |
Sen. John Milkovich [D] | Sen. Jean-Paul Morrell [D] | Sen. Karen Peterson [D] | Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
Sen. Rick Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 2/23/2017. |
2017-02-18 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |