LA SR64 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends Coach Nick Saban upon being inducted into the Louisiana Sports Hall of Fame.
Title
Commends Coach Nick Saban upon being inducted into the Louisiana Sports Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on SR 64 CO-AUTHORS (#278) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2021. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |