LA SR62 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/21/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/21/2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates April 18, 2022, as "Lineman Appreciation Day" at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Title
Designates April 18, 2022, as "Lineman Appreciation Day" at the Louisiana State Capitol.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/21/2022. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted. |