LA SR58 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Southern Mutual Help Association, Inc. on 50 years of working for social and employment equality.
Title
Commends the Southern Mutual Help Association, Inc. on 50 years of working for social and employment equality.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Mills [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/26/2019. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read by title and adopted. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |